No. 22-868 | |
Title: | Ariel Marcelo Bastias, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | March 10, 2023 |
Linked with 22A655 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-11416) |
Decision Date: | August 2, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 7, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 19 2023 | Application (22A655) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2023 to March 8, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jan 23 2023 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Jan 23 2023 | Application (22A655) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 8, 2023. |
Mar 08 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2023) |
Mar 29 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2023 to May 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 31 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2023. |
May 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to May 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
May 02 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 23, 2023. |
May 23 2023 | Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
David J. Zimmer Counsel of Record | Goodwin Proctor LLP 100 Northern Ave. Boston, MA 02210 dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com | (617) 570-1000 |
Party name: Ariel Marcelo Bastias | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |