No. 22-864 | |
Title: | Ohio, Petitioner v. D. R . |
Docketed: | March 10, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Ohio |
Case Numbers: | (2021-0934) |
Decision Date: | December 16, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 30, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 07 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2023 to May 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Benjamin Michael Flowers Counsel of Record | Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost 30 E. Broad St. Columbus, OH 43215 BENJAMIN.FLOWERS@OHIOATTORNEYGENERAL.GOV | 6144668980 |
Party name: Ohio | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Stuart Banner Counsel of Record | UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic 405 Hilgard Ave. Los Angeles, CA 90095 BANNER@LAW.UCLA.EDU | 3102068506 |
Party name: D.R. |