No. 22-859
Title:Securities and Exchange Commission, Petitioner
v.
George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2023
Linked with 22A596, 23A55
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-61007)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2023Application (22A596) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 19, 2023 to February 17, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 06 2023Application (22A596) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 17, 2023.
Jan 26 2023Application (22A596) to extend further the time from February 17, 2023 to March 20, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jan 30 2023Application (22A596) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 20, 2023.
Mar 08 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2023 to May 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2023.
Apr 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to June 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2023, for all respondents.
May 23 2023Brief of respondents George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jul 17 2023Motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2023Application (23A55) for leave to file briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 18 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 11, 2023.
Jul 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Andrew N. Vollmer in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2023Application for leave to file briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits (23A55) granted by Justice Alito provided that the opening and response briefs do not exceed 18,000 words each, and that the reply brief does not exceed 8,000 words.
Aug 21 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Aug 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ilan Wurman in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2023Brief of petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 28 2023Brief amicus curiae of Forum of United States Administrative Law Judges in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2023Amicus brief of Administrative Law Scholars not accepted for filing. (September 06, 2023)
Sep 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Federal Administrative Law Judges Conference filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Scholars(Sept. 12, 2023) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors John M. Golden and Thomas H. Lee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Association of Administrative Law Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Jed H. Shugerman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2023Motion of Administrative Law Scholars for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Securites and Exchange Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Sidney Michael McColloch
    Counsel of Record
S. Michael McColloch, PLLC
6060 N. Central Expressway
Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75206

SMM@MCCOLLOCH-LAW.COM
2146741868
Party name: George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al.
Karen Lundskow CookKaren Cook, PLLC
6060 N. Central Expressway
Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75206

KAREN@KARENCOOKLAW.COM
2147299098
Party name: George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al.
Other
Ronald William Chapman II
    Counsel of Record
Chapman Law Group
1441 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 310
Troy, MI 48098

rwchapman@chapmanlawgroup.com
(248) 644-6326
Party name: Federal Administrative Law Judges Conference
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

Jdubner@democracyforward.org
(202) 448-9090
Party name: Jed H. Shugerman
Deborah Delores Enix-Ross
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago , IL 60654

AMICUSBRIEFS@AMERICANBAR.ORG
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Steven Anson Glazer
    Counsel of Record
FORUM of United States Administrative Law Judges
P.O. Box 14076
Washington, DC 20044

forumalj@gmail.com
(301) 332-9214
Party name: FORUM of United States Administrative Law Judges
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

HHUNT@DEUTSCHHUNT.COM
2028686915
Party name: Association of Administrative Law Judges
Thomas H. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Hughes, Hubbard & Reed
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

thomas.lee@hugheshubbard.com
3473246000
Party name: Professors John M. Golden and Thomas H. Lee
Vincente Leon Martinez
    Counsel of Record
North American Securities Administrators Assoc.
750 First Street, NE, Suite 990
Washington, DC 20002

vmartinez@nasaa.org
202-3680419
Party name: The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc.
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

ABMORRISON@LAW.GWU.EDU
2029947120
Party name: Administrative Law Scholars
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

ANTHONY.SABINO@SABINOLAW.COM
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino
Andrew N. Vollmer
    Counsel of Record
Mercatus Center at George Mason University
3434 Washington Boulevard
Arlington, VA 22201

andrew.vollmer@gmail.com
703-993-8840
Party name: Andrew N. Vollmer
Julie Marie Wilson
    Counsel of Record
800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

JULIE.WILSON@NTEU.ORG
703-352-3325
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union
Ilan Wurman
    Counsel of Record
Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law
111 E. Taylor St , MC 9520
Phoenix, AZ 85004

ilan.wurman@asu.edu
480-965-2245
Party name: Professor Ilan Wurman
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

AZIEVE@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen