No. 22-848 | |
Title: | James Douglas Fox, Petitioner v. Mark Campbell, et ux. |
Docketed: | March 8, 2023 |
Linked with 22A531 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-5044) |
Decision Date: | August 29, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 3, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 13 2022 | Application (22A531) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2022 to March 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Dec 16 2022 | Application (22A531) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 2, 2023. |
Mar 02 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Robyn Beale Williams Counsel of Record | Farrar & Bates, LLP 12 Cadillac Drive Suite 480 Brentwood, TN 37027 ROBYN.WILLIAMS@FARRAR-BATES.COM | 615-254-3060 |
Party name: James Douglas Fox |