No. 22-846 | |
Title: | Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service, Petitioner v. Reginald Kirtz |
Docketed: | March 7, 2023 |
Linked with 22A642 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-2149) |
Decision Date: | August 24, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 3, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 17 2023 | Application (22A642) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 1, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 17 2023 | Application (22A642) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 3, 2023. |
Mar 03 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2023) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Mar 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2023 to May 8, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Department of Agriculture Rural Development Rural Housing Service | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Matthew Benjamin Weisberg Counsel of Record | Weisberg Law 7 S. Morton Ave. Morton, PA 19070 MWEISBERG@WEISBERGLAWOFFICES.COM | 6106900801 |
Party name: Reginald Kirtz | ||
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi | Public Citizen Litigation Group 1600 20th Street, NW Washington, DC 20009 NJOSHI@CITIZEN.ORG | (202) 588-1000 |
Party name: Reginald Kirtz |