No. 22-842 | |
Title: | National Rifle Association of America, Petitioner v. Maria T. Vullo |
Docketed: | March 6, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-636-cv) |
Decision Date: | September 22, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 9, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 07 2023 | Motion (22M73) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. |
Feb 07 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 15 2023 | MOTION (22M73) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023. |
Mar 06 2023 | Motion (22M73) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. |
Mar 21 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Financial & Business Law Scholars filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 05 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 05 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 19 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. |
Apr 24 2023 | Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2023) |
Apr 26 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2023 to June 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 23, 2023. |
May 23 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 23 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Goldwater Institute. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 24 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 24 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 23 2023 | Brief of respondent Maria T. Vullo in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 07 2023 | Reply of petitioner National Rifle Association of America filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jul 12 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Oct 02 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. |
Oct 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023. |
Oct 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. |
Oct 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023. |
Nov 03 2023 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Goldwater Institute DENIED. |
Nov 03 2023 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Eugene Volokh Counsel of Record | UCLA School of Law 385 Charles E. Young Dr. E Los Angeles, CA 90095 volokh@law.ucla.edu | 310-206-3926 |
Party name: National Rifle Association of America | ||
Noah Barnett Peters | Brewer Attorneys & Counselors 750 Lexington Ave., 14th Floor New York, NY 10222 NBP@BREWERATTORNEYS.COM | 4344664641 |
Party name: National Rifle Association of America | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Trevor William Morrison Counsel of Record | Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP 350 Fifth Avenue 63rd Floor New York, NY 10118 tmorrison@kaplanhecker.com | 212-763-0883 |
Party name: Maria T. Vullo | ||
Andrew G. Celli Jr. | Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP 600 Fifth Avenue, 10th Floor New York, NY 10020 acelli@ecbawm.com | (212) 763-5000 |
Party name: Maria T. Vullo | ||
Other | ||
John Franklin Bash Counsel of Record | Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 1300 I St. NW, Suite 900 Washington, DC 20005 johnbash@quinnemanuel.com | (202) 538-8000 |
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression | ||
R. Trent McCotter Counsel of Record | Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC 801 17th Street, N.W. Suite 350 Washington, DC 20006 MCCOTTER@BOYDENGRAYASSOCIATES.COM | 202-706-5488 |
Party name: Financial & Business Law Scholars | ||
Jeremiah Lee Morgan Counsel of Record | William J. Olson, P.C. 370 Maple Avenue West Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180-5615 jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com | 7033565070 |
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Heller Foundation, America's Future, Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Public Advocate of the United States, Leadership Institute, Free Speech Coalition, Free Speech Defense and Education Fund, DownsizeDC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund | ||
Lanora Christine Pettit Counsel of Record | Office of the Texas Attorney General P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: The States of Texas and Indiana | ||
Timothy Mason Sandefur Counsel of Record | Goldwater Institute 500 E. Coronado Road Phoenix, AZ 85004 TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG | 6024625000 |
Party name: Goldwater Institute | ||
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr. Counsel of Record | Montana Attorney General's Office 215 North Sanders Street Helena, MT 59601 PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV | 406-444-2026 |
Party name: Montana | ||
Charles Devin Watkins Counsel of Record | Competitive Enterprise Institute 1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor Washington, DC 20005 devin.watkins@cei.org | 503-753-8104 |
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute |