No. 22-840 | |
Title: | K. M., Individually and on Behalf of M. M. and S. M., et al., Petitioners v. Eric L. Adams, Mayor of the City of New York, et al. |
Docketed: | March 3, 2023 |
Linked with 22A464 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-4128) |
Decision Date: | August 31, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 22 2022 | Application (22A464) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 29, 2022 to February 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main Document | |
Nov 30 2022 | Application (22A464) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 27, 2023. |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 3, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 06 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Austin Independent School District to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 07 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents Middletown Township Public Schools, West Orange Public Schools, Cherry Hill Public Schools and Readington Township Public Schools to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 08 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents Eric L. Adams, David C. Banks, New York City Department of Education to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 28 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent New York State Department of Education to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 28 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Pennsylvania Department of Education to respond filed. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Rory J. Bellantoni Counsel of Record | Brain Injury Rights Group, Ltd. 300 E. 95th Street Suite 130 New York, NY 10128 RORY@PABILAW.ORG | 914-393-3604 |
Party name: K. M., Individually and on Behalf of M. M. and S. M., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Jonathan Griffin Brush Counsel of Record | Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P. 5718 Westheimer, Suite 1200 Houston, TX 77057 JBRUSH@RMGLLP.COM | 7139606000 |
Party name: Austin Independent School District | ||
Eric Labes Harrison Counsel of Record | Methfessel & Werbel, PC 2025 Lincoln Highway Suite 200 Edison, NJ 08818 HARRISON@METHWERB.COM | 7322484200 |
Party name: Middletown Township Public Schools, West Orange Public Schools, Cherry Hill Public Schools and Readington Township Public Schools | ||
Diana Lawless Counsel of Record | New York City Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel 100 Church Street New York, NY 10007 dlawless@law.nyc.gov | 212-356-0848 |
Party name: Eric L. Adams, David C. Banks, New York City Department of Education | ||
Michael John Scarinci Counsel of Record | Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General 15th Floor, Strawberry Square Harrisburg, PA 17120 MSCARINCI@ATTORNEYGENERAL.GOV | 7178572184 |
Party name: Pennsylvania Department of Education | ||
Barbara Dale Underwood Counsel of Record | Solicitor General Office of the Attorney General 28 Liberty Street New York, NY 10005-1400 BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV | 212-416-8016 |
Party name: New York State Department of Education | ||
Amy Dawn Demmler | Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P. 5718 Westheimer Road, Suite 1200 Houston, TX 77057 ADEMMLER@RMGLLP.COM | 713-960-6002 |
Party name: Austin Independent School District |