No. 22-84
Title:Saad Sakkal, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 28, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3880)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 29, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Robbins Russell
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@kramerlevin.com
(202) 775-4501
Party name: Saad Sakkal
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States