No. 22-828 | |
Title: | Roger E. Pace, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | March 1, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-2151) |
Decision Date: | September 9, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 28, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2023) |
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2023 to May 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Tom Drysdale Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender 300 W Main Urbana, IL 61801 THOMAS_DRYSDALE@FD.ORG | 2173730666 |
Party name: Roger E. Pace | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |