No. 22-827
Title:Carlos Herrera, Daniel Sanchez, and Anthony Ray Baca, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:March 1, 2023
Linked with 22A645
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2126, 19-2141, 19-2195)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 13 2023Application (22A645) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2023 to February 24, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 20 2023Application (22A645) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 24, 2023.
Feb 24 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2023 to May 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

JROSENKRANZ@ORRICK.COM
212-506-5380
Party name: Carlos Herrera, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America