No. 22-824 | |
Title: | The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, et al., Petitioners v. Alexander Belya |
Docketed: | March 1, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1498) |
Decision Date: | September 16, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 8, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2023 to May 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Diana Marie Verm Counsel of Record | The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty 1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW Suite 400 Washington, DC 20006 dthomson@becketlaw.org | 2029550095 |
Party name: The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Bradley Scott Girard Counsel of Record | Americans United for Separation of Church & State 1310 L St. NW, Suite 200 Washington, DC 20005 GIRARD@AU.ORG | (202) 898-2145 |
Party name: Alexander Belya |