No. 22-822 | |
Title: | Avery Dennison Corporation, Petitioner v. ADASA Inc. |
Docketed: | March 1, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2022-1092) |
Decision Date: | December 16, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2023) |
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 03 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent ADASA, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Mar 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
Mar 14 2023 | Response Requested. (Due April 13, 2023) |
Mar 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 13, 2023 to May 2, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 2, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Derek L. Shaffer Counsel of Record | Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 1300 I Street NW, Suite 900 Washington, DC 20005 DEREKSHAFFER@QUINNEMANUEL.COM | (202) 538-8000 |
Party name: Avery Dennison Corporation | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Robert P. Greenspoon Counsel of Record | Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC 333 N. Michigan Ave Suite 2700 Chicago, IL 60601 RGREENSPOON@DBLLAWYERS.COM | 312-551-9500 |
Party name: ADASA, Inc. |