No. 22-821 | |
Title: | Chevron Corporation, et al., Petitioners v. City of Hoboken, New Jersey, et al. |
Docketed: | March 1, 2023 |
Linked with 22A528 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-2728, 22-1096) |
Decision Date: | August 17, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 12 2022 | Application (22A528) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 29, 2022 to February 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor (Justice Alito is recused.) |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service | |
Dec 16 2022 | Application (22A528) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 27, 2023. |
Dec 20 2022 | Response to application from respondent City of Hoboken, Delaware, et al. submitted December 16, 2022 and received December 20, 2022. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 27 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 333 South Grand Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90071 TBOUTROUS@GIBSONDUNN.COM | (213) 229-7000 |
Party name: Chevron Corporation and Chevron U.S.A. Inc. |