No. 22-815 | |
Title: | Victor B. Skaar, Petitioner v. Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs |
Docketed: | February 28, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2021-1757, 2021-1812) |
Decision Date: | September 8, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 17, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 24 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 02 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2023 to May 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Michael J. Wishnie Counsel of Record | Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Veterans Legal Services Clinic P.O. Box 209090 New Haven, CT 06520-9090 MICHAEL.WISHNIE@YALE.EDU | (203) 432-4800 |
Party name: Victor B. Skaar | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs |