No. 22-81
Title:Nathaniel Lambert, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:July 27, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-KA-0777, 2018-KA-1024)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 26, 2022

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2022Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Nathaniel Lambert
Attorneys for Respondent
Bradley Michael Scott
    Counsel of Record
Orleans Parish District Attorney
619 S. White Street
New Orleans, LA 70119

bscott@orleansda.com
5042341666
Party name: Louisiana