No. 22-80
Title:Frank Napolitano, et al., Petitioners
v.
Laurence Washington
Docketed:July 27, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-455)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
James N. Tallberg
    Counsel of Record
Karsten and Tallberg, LLC
8 Lowell Road
West Hartford, CT 06119

jtallberg@kt-lawfirm.com
860-233-5600
Party name: Frank Napolitano, et al.