No. 22-8
Title:Anthony Momphard, Jr., Individually and in His Official Capacity as a Deputy Sheriff of the Macon County Sheriff's Department, et al., Petitioners
v.
Melissa B. Knibbs, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Scott Knibbs
Docketed:July 1, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2243)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Melissa B. Knibbs to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Aug 08 2022Response Requested. (Due September 7, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven Andrew Bader
    Counsel of Record
Cranfill Sumner LLP
P.O. Box 27808
Raleigh, NC 27611

sbader@cshlaw.com
919-828-5100
Party name: Anthony Momphard, Jr., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Russell Melrose
    Counsel of Record
Melrose Law PLLC
P.O. Box 567
Waynesville, NC 28786

melrose@mountainverdict.com
8284523141
Party name: Melissa B. Knibbs