No. 22-775 | |
Title: | Samuel Dacostagomez-Aguilar, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | February 17, 2023 |
Linked with 22A574 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-13576) |
Decision Date: | July 19, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 17, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 19 2022 | Application (22A574) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2023 to March 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 19 2022 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Dec 23 2022 | Application (22A574) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 14, 2023. |
Jan 31 2023 | Application (22A574) to extend further the time from February 14, 2023 to March 16, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 07 2023 | Application (22A574) denied by Justice Thomas. |
Feb 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2023) |
Mar 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2023 to April 19, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Charles Roth Counsel of Record | National Immigration Justice Center 224 S. Michigan Ave., Ste. 600 Chicago, IL 60604 croth@heartlandalliance.org | 3126601613 |
Party name: Samuel Dacostagomez-Aguilar | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Garland, Merrick B. |