No. 22-76
Title:Keith L. Carnes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 26, 2022
Linked with 21A596
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3170)
   Decision Date:January 3, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 23, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 07 2022Application (21A596) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2022 to July 22, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 12 2022Application (21A596) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 22, 2022.
Jul 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029425000
Party name: Keith Carnes
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States