No. 22-756 | |
Title: | Lannette Linthicum, et al., Petitioners v. Robin Wayne Smith |
Docketed: | February 10, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-20232) |
Decision Date: | October 12, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 10, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 08 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 29 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Judd Edward Stone II Counsel of Record | Texas Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 JUDD.STONE@OAG.TEXAS.GOV | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: Lannette Linthicum, et al. |