No. 22-75 | |
Title: | ForwardLine Financial, LLC, et al., Petitioners v. Brandon Ahlmann |
Docketed: | July 27, 2022 |
Linked with 21A749 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
Case Numbers: | (B304367) |
Decision Date: | November 12, 2021 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | February 23, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 11 2022 | Application (21A749) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2022 to July 23, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main Document | |
May 20 2022 | Application (21A749) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 23, 2022. |
Jul 22 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2022) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 07 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022. |
Sep 08 2022 | Response Requested. (Due October 11, 2022) |
Oct 11 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 11, 2022 to November 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 10, 2022. |
Nov 03 2022 | Brief of respondent Brandon Ahlmann in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 16 2022 | Reply of petitioners ForwardLine Financial, LLC, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022. |
Dec 12 2022 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana, 596 U. S. ___ (2022). |
Jan 13 2023 | Judgment and mandate issued. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Lisa Marie Burnett Counsel of Record | Sacro and Walker LLP 700 North Brand Boulevard, Suite 610 Glendale, CA 91203 lburnett@sacrowalker.com | 7262013555 |
Party name: ForwardLine Financial, LLC, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Douglas Han Counsel of Record | Justice Law Corporation 751 N. Fair Oaks Ave. Pasadena, CA 9113 dhan@justicelawcorp.com | 818-230-7502 |
Party name: Brandon Ahlmann |