No. 22-747 | |
Title: | Tracy Renee Pennington, Petitioner v. West Virginia |
Docketed: | February 9, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia |
Case Numbers: | (21-0396) |
Decision Date: | November 14, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 07 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 10 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2023 to April 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 3, 2023. |
Mar 09 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 13 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 13 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of North Dakota Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Fred Anthony Rowley Jr. Counsel of Record | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati 633 W. 5th Street Suite 1550 Los Angeles, CA 90071 FRED.ROWLEY@WSGR.COM | 2136839100 |
Party name: Tracy Renee Pennington | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Lindsay Sara See Counsel of Record | Office of the West Virginia Attorney General State Capitol Complex Building 1, Room E-26 Charleston, WV 25305 LINDSAY.S.SEE@WVAGO.GOV | 3045582021 |
Party name: State of West Virginia | ||
Other | ||
Daniel Benjamin Levin Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles and Olson LLP 350 South Grand Ave. Los Angeles, CA 90071 DANIEL.LEVIN@MTO.COM | 213-683-9135 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers | ||
Clark M. Neily III Counsel of Record | Cato Institute 1000 Mass. Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 CNEILY@CATO.ORG | 2024257499 |
Party name: Cato Institute | ||
John S. Williams Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly, LLP 725 Twelfth Street N.W. Washington, DC 20005 JWILLIAMS@WC.COM | 202-434-5646 |
Party name: North Dakota Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers |