No. 22-7386 | |
Title: | Louis McIntosh, aka Lou D, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | April 27, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (14-1908) |
Decision Date: | January 25, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 24 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 30, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | |
May 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 30, 2023 to June 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
May 23 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2023. |
Jun 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2023 to July 31, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jun 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 31, 2023. |
Jul 31 2023 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Sep 29 2023 | Motion of petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. |
Oct 11 2023 | Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 27, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 10, 2024. |
Nov 27 2023 | Brief of petitioner Louis McIntosh filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 27 2023 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Steven Y. Yurowitz Counsel of Record | Newman & Greenberg 950 Third Avenue 31st Floor New York, NY 10022 SYUROWITZ@NEWMANGREENBERG.COM | 212-308-7900 |
Party name: Louis McIntosh | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |