No. 22-734 | |
Title: | Rafael Gomez-Vargas, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | February 6, 2023 |
Linked with 22A548 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-60429) |
Decision Date: | October 5, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 16 2022 | Application (22A548) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2023 to February 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Dec 16 2022 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filiing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Dec 21 2022 | Application (22A548) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 2, 2023. |
Feb 02 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2023) |
Feb 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2023 to April 7, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Feb 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2023. |
Mar 30 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 7, 2023 to May 8, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 31 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jaime Ann Santos Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter LLP 1900 N St. NW Washington, DC 20036 JSANTOS@GOODWINLAW.COM | 202-346-4000 |
Party name: Rafael Gomez-Vargas | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Garland, Att'y Gen., Merrick B. |