No. 22-730
Title:Michael Rop, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Housing Finance Agency, et al.
Docketed:February 6, 2023
Linked with 22A542
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2071)
   Decision Date:October 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2022Application (22A542) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 2, 2023 to February 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 17 2022Application (22A542) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 2, 2023.
Feb 02 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 8, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2023 to April 7, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2023.
Mar 27 2023Motion of Department of the Treasury for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Michael Rop, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Treasury