No. 22-721
Title:Damian McElrath, Petitioner
v.
Georgia
Docketed:February 2, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Georgia
   Case Numbers:(S22A0605)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 31 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 6, 2023 to April 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 5, 2023.
Mar 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2023Brief of respondent Georgia in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2023Reply of petitioner Damian McElrath filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 01 2023Record Requested.
May 04 2023Electronic record received from the Supreme Court of Georgia.
May 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
May 22 2023Rescheduled.
May 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023.
May 30 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023.
Jun 05 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 12 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023.
Jun 12 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jul 10 2023Motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 13, 2023.
Aug 29 2023Brief of petitioner Damian McElrath filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers (GACDL) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

RSIMPSON@WILEY.LAW
202-719-7314
Party name: Damian McElrath
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen John Petrany
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

SPETRANY@LAW.GA.GOV
404-458-3408
Party name: Georgia
Other
Carmen Gloria Iguina Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

ciguina@kaplanhecker.com
212-763-0883
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, American Civil Liberties Union, and American Civil Liberties Union of Georgia
Gregory Allen Willis
    Counsel of Record
Willis Law Firm, PC
6000 Lake Forrest Drive
Ste 375
Atlanta, GA 30328

Gw@willislawga.com
4048355553
Party name: Georgia Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers (GACDL)