No. 22-714 | |
Title: | Harry C. Calcutt, III, Petitioner v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation |
Docketed: | February 1, 2023 |
Linked with 22A330 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-4303) |
Decision Date: | June 10, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 15, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 17 2022 | Application (22A330) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2022 to January 30, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Oct 21 2022 | Application (22A330) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 30, 2023. |
Jan 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 3, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2023 to April 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 3, 2023. |
Feb 24 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 01 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 02 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Separation of Powers Clinic filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 03 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The American Association of Bank Directors filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 03 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 03 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Sarah Michelle Harris III Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 680 Maine Avenue SW Washington, DC 20024 SHARRIS@WC.COM | 202-434-5599 |
Party name: Harry C. Calcutt | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation | ||
Other | ||
Markham Sterling Chenoweth Counsel of Record | New Civil Liberties Alliance 1225 19th Street NW Suite 450 Washington, DC 20036 MARK.CHENOWETH@NCLA.ONMICROSOFT.COM | 2028695210 |
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance | ||
Thomas Michael Johnson Jr. Counsel of Record | Wiley Rein LLP 2050 M Street NW Washington, DC 20036 TMJOHNSON@WILEY.LAW | 2027194550 |
Party name: The American Association of Bank Directors | ||
Margaret Ann Little | New Civil Liberties Alliance 1225 19th St. NW, Ste. 450 Washington, DC 20036 PEGGY.LITTLE@NCLA.ONMICROSOFT.COM | 2028695212 |
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance | ||
John Mercer Masslon II Counsel of Record | Washington Legal Foundation 2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20036 JMASSLON@WLF.ORG | (202) 588-0302 |
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation | ||
R. Trent McCotter Counsel of Record | Separation of Powers Clinic, Gray Center 3301 Fairfax Dr. Arlington, VA 22201 rmccotte@gmu.edu | 202-706-5488 |
Party name: Separation of Powers Clinic | ||
Michael David Pepson Counsel of Record | Americans for Prosperity Foundation 1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700 Arlington, VA 22201 mpepson@afphq.org | 5713294529 |
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation | ||
Andrew John Pincus Counsel of Record | Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM | 202-263-3000 |
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America |