No. 22-70
Title:Tyson Foods, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Hus Hari Buljic, et al.
Docketed:July 26, 2022
Linked with 21A709
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1010, 21-1012)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 22, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2022Application (21A709) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2022 to June 22, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 13 2022Application (21A709) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until June 22, 2022.
Jun 07 2022Application (21A709) to extend further the time from June 22, 2022 to July 22, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Written Request
Jun 21 2022Application (21A709) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 22, 2022.
Jul 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent Hus Hari Buljic, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 22 2022Response Requested. (Due October 24, 2022)
Sep 27 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2022 to November 23, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 23, 2022.
Nov 22 2022Brief of respondents Hus Hari Buljic, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 07 2022Reply of petitioners Tyson Foods, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 26 2023Supplemental brief of respondents Hus Hari Buljic, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Tyson Foods, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam Ross Pulver
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th St. NW
Washington, DC 20009

apulver@citizen.org
202-588-7790
Party name: Hus Hari Buljic, et al.