No. 22-693 | |
Title: | Michael Johnson, Petitioner v. Susan Prentice, et al. |
Docketed: | January 25, 2023 |
Linked with 22A416 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-3535) |
Decision Date: | March 31, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 25, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 07 2022 | Application (22A416) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 23, 2022 to December 23, 2022, submitted to Justice Barrett. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 09 2022 | Application (22A416) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until December 23, 2022. |
Nov 30 2022 | Application (22A416) to extend further the time from December 23, 2022 to January 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Barrett. |
Written RequestProof of Service | |
Dec 02 2022 | Application (22A416) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until January 22, 2023. |
Jan 23 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 24 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents Susan Prentice, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Feb 24 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor John F. Stinneford filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 24 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Former Corrections Executives Martin F. Horn, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. |
Mar 16 2023 | Response Requested. (Due April 17, 2023) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Daniel M. Greenfield Counsel of Record | MacArthur Justice Center 501 H St NE Suite 275 Washington, DC 20002 DANIEL.GREENFIELD@MACARTHURJUSTICE.ORG | (312) 503-8538 |
Party name: Michael Johnson | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Frank Henry Bieszczat Counsel of Record | Office of the Illinois Attorney General 100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor Chicago, IL 60601 FRANK.BIESZCZAT@ILAG.GOV | 312-814-2090 |
Party name: Susan Prentice, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Laura L. Rovner Counsel of Record | Student Law Office | Civil Rights Clinic University of Denver College of Law 2255 E. Evans Avenue, Suite 335 Denver, CO 80208 LROVNER@LAW.DU.EDU | (303) 871-6441 |
Party name: Former Corrections Executives Martin F. Horn, Scott Frakes, Steve J. Martin, Ron McAndrew, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley, Eldon Vail, and Roger Werholtz | ||
Andrew Timothy Tutt Counsel of Record | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer 601 Massachusetts Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001 ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM | 202-942-5000 |
Party name: John F. Stinneford |