No. 22-687 | |
Title: | Randall S. Goulding, Petitioner v. Securities and Exchange Commission |
Docketed: | January 24, 2023 |
Linked with 22A461 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-1689) |
Decision Date: | July 7, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 7, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 22 2022 | Application (22A461) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2022 to January 20, 2023, submitted to Justice Barrett. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 28 2022 | Application (22A461) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until January 20, 2023. |
Jan 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountAppendixProof of Service | |
Feb 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 23, 2023 to March 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2023. |
Mar 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2023 to April 26, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 26, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Bradley Joseph Bondi Counsel of Record | Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP 1990 K Street, N.W. Suite 950 Washington, DC 20006 BBONDI@CAHILL.COM | 202.862.8910 |
Party name: Randall S. Goulding | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission |