No. 22-685 Vide 22-6653 | |
Title: | Jerry Wayne Wilkerson, et al., Petitioners v. United States |
Docketed: | January 24, 2023 |
Linked with 22A433 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-5897, 20-5920, 20-5946, 20-6010) |
Decision Date: | June 23, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 25, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 10 2022 | Application (22A433) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 23, 2022 to January 20, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | |
Nov 16 2022 | Application (22A433) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 20, 2023. |
Jan 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 23, 2023 to March 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2023. |
Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2023 to April 26, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 26, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Lawrence David Rosenberg Counsel of Record | Jones Day 51 Louisiana Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001 LDROSENBERG@JONESDAY.COM | (202) 879-3939 |
Party name: Jerry Wayne Wilkerson | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |