No. 22-674 Vide 22-884 | |
Title: | Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | January 20, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-60262) |
Decision Date: | December 1, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 18 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2023) |
Jan 18 2023 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Jan 31 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2023 to March 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Feb 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 24, 2023. |
Mar 24 2023 | Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed. |
Jun 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023. |
Jun 06 2023 | Reply of petitioner Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 29 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023. |
Jun 30 2023 | Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-884 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED. |
Jun 30 2023 | Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 22-674. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 22-674. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” |
Jun 30 2023 | As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions. |
Jul 27 2023 | Letter proposing a briefing schedule filed by the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties filed. VIDED. |
Main Document | |
Aug 04 2023 | The briefing proposal set forth in the Solicitor General’s letter of July 27, 2023, is adopted. The Solicitor General shall file a consolidated opening brief on the merits, limited to 17,000 words, on or before August 29, 2023. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support, or in support of neither party, shall bear a light green cover. Petitioner in No. 22-674 and respondents in No. 22-884 may each file a response brief on the merits on or before October 18, 2023, and the briefs shall bear light red covers. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support shall bear a dark green cover. The Solicitor General shall file a consolidated reply brief limited to 9,000 words. VIDED |
Aug 29 2023 | Brief of Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 29 2023 | Joint appendix filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Raed Gonzalez Counsel of Record | Gonzalez Olivieri LLC 9920 Gulf Fwy. Ste.100 Houston, TX 77034 rgonzalez@gonzalezolivierillc.com | (713) 481-3040 |
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves | ||
Nadia Anguiano | Federal Immigration Litigation Clinic James H. Binger Center for New Americans, University of Minnesota Law School 229 19th Ave. S. Minneapolis, MN 55455 angui010@umn.edu | (612) 301-8653 |
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves | ||
Elizabeth Graber Bentley | Civil Rights Appellate Clinic University of Minnesota Law School 229 19th Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55455 EBENTLEY@UMN.EDU | 612-625-7809 |
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves | ||
Ross Alan Miller | Gonzalez Olivieri LLC 9920 Gulf Way Fwy, Suite 100 Houston, TX 77034 rmiller@gonzalezolivierillc.com | 3152441098 |
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves | ||
Amanda Lea Waterhouse | Waterhouse Dominguez & Strom, PLLC PO Box 671067 Houston, TX 77267 awaterhouse@wdslawyers.com | 713-930-1430 |
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Saad Ahmad Counsel of Record | Saad Ahmad and Associates 39111 Paseo Padre Pkwy Fremont, CA 94538 saadahmadlawfirm@gmail.com | 5107139847 |
Party name: Varinder Singh | ||
Easha Anand Counsel of Record | Stanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic 559 Nathan Abbott Way Stanford, CA 94305 EANAND@STANFORD.EDU | (650) 724-3345 |
Party name: Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General | ||
Other | ||
Christopher J. Hajec Counsel of Record | Immigration Reform Law Institute 25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335 Washington, DC 20001 CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG | 202-232-5590 |
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute |