No. 22-666 | |
Title: | Situ Kamu Wilkinson, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Docketed: | January 20, 2023 |
Linked with 22A516 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-3166) |
Decision Date: | September 19, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 08 2022 | Application (22A516) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2022 to February 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Dec 08 2022 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Dec 12 2022 | Application (22A516) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 17, 2023. |
Jan 17 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2023) |
Feb 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Feb 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2023. |
Mar 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2023 to May 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 17 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 5, 2023. |
May 02 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2023 to May 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
May 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2023. |
May 12 2023 | Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in response to the petition for certiorari filed. |
May 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023. |
May 30 2023 | Reply of petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 09 2023 | Rescheduled. |
Jun 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023. |
Jun 29 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023. |
Jun 30 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
Jun 30 2023 | As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions. |
Jul 24 2023 | Motion for an extension of time for the filing of the briefs on the merits filed. |
Main Document | |
Jul 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2023. |
Aug 10 2023 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 29 2023 | Brief of petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Organizations Assisting Survivors of Domestic Violence filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 05 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 08 2023 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jaime Ann Santos Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter LLP 1900 N St. NW Washington, DC 20036 jsantos@goodwinlaw.com | 202-346-4000 |
Party name: Situ Kamu Wilkinson | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Garland, Attorney General of the United States | ||
Other | ||
Lee Turner Friedman Counsel of Record | Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP 2000 K Street NW, Suite 400 Washington, DC 20006 ltfriedman@kramerlevin.com | 202-775-4526 |
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association | ||
Thomas Gregory Sprankling Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP 2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400 Palo Alto, CA 94306 Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com | 650-858-6062 |
Party name: Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges | ||
Zachary D. Tripp Counsel of Record | Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP 2001 M Street NW Washington, DC 20036 ZACK.TRIPP@WEIL.COM | (202) 682-7000 |
Party name: Organizations Assisting Survivors of Domestic Violence |