No. 22-660 | |
Title: | Trevor Murray, Petitioner v. UBS Securities, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | January 18, 2023 |
Linked with 22A438 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-4202, 21-56) |
Decision Date: | August 5, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 15, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 11 2022 | Application (22A438) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2022 to January 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther | |
Nov 16 2022 | Application (22A438) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 13, 2023. |
Jan 13 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 17, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 17, 2023 to March 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 20, 2023. |
Feb 17 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 17 2023 | Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Ron Wyden, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 20 2023 | Brief of respondents UBS Securities, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Robert Lloyd Herbst Counsel of Record | Herbst Law, PLLC 420 Lexington Avenue Suite 300 New York, NY 10170 rherbst@herbstlawny.com | (914) 450-8163 |
Party name: Trevor Murray | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Eugene Scalia Counsel of Record | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 ESCALIA@GIBSONDUNN.COM | (202) 955-8673 |
Party name: UBS Securities, LLC, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Thomas Michael Devine Counsel of Record | Government Accountability Project 1612 K Street, NW, #1100 Washington, DC, DC 20902 TOMD@WHISTLEBLOWER.ORG | 240-888-4080 |
Party name: U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley | ||
Alan Robert Kabat | Bernabei & Kabat, PLLC 1400 - 16th Street, N.W., Suite 500 Washington, DC 20036-2223 KABAT@BERNABEIPLLC.COM | 202-745-1942 |
Party name: U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley | ||
Adam Ross Pulver Counsel of Record | Public Citizen Litigation Group 1600 20th St. NW Washington, DC 20009 APULVER@CITIZEN.ORG | 202-588-7790 |
Party name: Public Citizen |