No. 22-652 | |
Title: | Pavel Ivanovich Lazarenko, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | January 13, 2023 |
Linked with 22A498 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-10225, 21-10250) |
Decision Date: | September 12, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 02 2022 | Application (22A498) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2022 to February 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. (Justice Kagan is recused.) |
Main Document | |
Dec 08 2022 | Application (22A498) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 10, 2023. |
Jan 10 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 19 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. |
Feb 01 2023 | Response Requested. (Due March 3, 2023) |
Feb 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2023 to April 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 24 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 3, 2023. |
Mar 27 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2023 to May 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 28 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 3, 2023. |
May 03 2023 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
May 18 2023 | Reply of petitioner Pavel Ivanovich Lazarenko filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/8/2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Matthew Nis Leerberg Counsel of Record | Fox Rothschild LLP 434 Fayetteville Street Suite 2800 Raleigh, NC 27601 mleerberg@foxrothschild.com | (919) 755-8759 |
Party name: Pavel Ivanovich Lazarenko | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Brian Halligan Fletcher Counsel of Record | Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW Washington, DC 20530 CHERI.WILLIAMS2@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2201 |
Party name: United States |