No. 22-644
Title:Anthony Lomax, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 11, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2274)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 10, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 27 2023Supplemental brief of petitioner Anthony Lomax filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: Anthony Lomax
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America