No. 22-64
Title:Samuel Arrington, Petitioner
v.
City of Los Angeles, California, et al.
Docketed:July 25, 2022
Linked with 21A506
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56755)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:December 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2022Application (21A506) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2022 to May 16, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Mar 16 2022Application (21A506) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 16, 2022.
May 16 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2022Waiver of right of respondent City of Los Angeles, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nazareth M. Haysbert
    Counsel of Record
Haysbert Moultrie, LLP
4640 Admiralty Way, Suite 500
Marina del Rey, CA 90292

Nazareth@hmlaw.la
310-496-5796
Party name: Samuel Calhoun Arrington
Attorneys for Respondents
Shaun Dabby Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Los Angeles City Attorney's Office
200 No. Spring Street, 14th Floor, City Hall
Los Angeles, CA 90012

shaun.jacobs@lacity.org
(213) 978-2704
Party name: City of Los Angeles, et al.