No. 22-639
Title:Arthrex, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Smith & Nephew, Inc., et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2023
Linked with 22A359
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2140)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2022Application (22A359) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 9, 2022 to January 8, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOtherLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 28 2022Application (22A359) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 8, 2023.
Jan 06 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 9, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2023 to March 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 13, 2023, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: Arthrex, Inc.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States