No. 22-6389 Vide 22-6640 | |
Title: | Justin Rashaad Brown, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | December 23, 2022 |
Linked with 22A453 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1510) |
Decision Date: | August 29, 2022 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 18 2022 | Application (22A453) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 22 2022 | Application (22A453) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 28, 2022. |
Dec 21 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 23, 2023) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 23, 2023 to February 22, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2023. |
Feb 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2023 to March 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 16 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 24, 2023. |
Mar 24 2023 | Brief of respondent United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 12 2023 | Reply of petitioner Justin Rashaad Brown filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. |
May 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. |
May 15 2023 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-6640 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED. |
May 25 2023 | Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 22-6389. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 22-6389. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Lee Adler Counsel of Record | Federal Public Defender's Office One East Broward Blvd. Suite 1100 Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 ANDREW_ADLER@FD.ORG | 305-533-4194 |
Party name: Eugene Jackson | ||
Jeffrey T. Green Counsel of Record | Sidley Austin 1501 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20005 jgreen@sidley.com | 202 736 8291 |
Party name: Justin Rashaad Brown | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |