No. 22-634
Vide 22-566
Title:Richard Estle Carson, III, Petitioner
v.
Kathryn Hyland, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-3765, 20-3766)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 7, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 30 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2023, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Alan Isaacson
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson
6580 Avenida Mirola
La Jolla, CA 92037-6231

ericalanisaacson@icloud.com
858-263-9581
Party name: Richard Estle Carson III
Attorneys for Respondents
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay Elsberg Pllc
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

CHALLIGAN@SELENDYGAY.COM
(212) 390-9000
Party name: Hyland, Garcia, Saint-Paul, Spitler-Lawson, Means, Kaplan, Guth, Nocerino, Taylor and Church