No. 22-631
Vide 22-669
Title:Highland Capital Management, L.P., Petitioner
v.
NexPoint Advisors, L.P., et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2023
Linked with 22A397
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-10449)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2022Application (22A397) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2022 to January 5, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Nov 08 2022Application (22A397) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 5, 2023.
Jan 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2023 to February 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2023Waiver of right of respondents Highland Income Fund; NexPoint Strategic Opportunities Fund; Highland Global Allocation Fund; and NexPoint Capital, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 15, 2023.
Feb 06 2023Waiver of right of respondent The Dugaboy Investment Trust to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 10 2023Brief of respondent NexPoint Advisors, L.P., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023.
Mar 20 2023Response Requested. (Due April 19, 2023)
Apr 11 2023Letter dated April 11, 2023 from counsel for respondents Highland Income Fund, et al. filed.
Main Document
Apr 19 2023Response to petition from respondents The Dugaboy Investment Trust and Get Good Trust filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Apr 21 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Apr 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 15 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@kramerlevin.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas S. Draper
    Counsel of Record
Heller Draper & Horn, LLC
650 Poydras St., Ste. #2500
New Orleans, LA 70130

ddraper@hellerdraper.com
504-236-0138
Party name: The Dugaboy Investment Trust
David R. Fine
    Counsel of Record
K & L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
18th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

DAVID.FINE@KLGATES.COM
(717) 231-4500
Party name: Highland Income Fund; NexPoint Strategic Opportunities Fund; Highland Global Allocation Fund; and NexPoint Capital, Inc.
William Scott Hastings
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
2200 Ross Ave.
Suite 2800
Dallas, TX 75201-6776

SHASTINGS@LOCKELORD.COM
(214) 740-8537
Party name: The Dugaboy Investment Trust and Get Good Trust
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

JLAMKEN@MOLOLAMKEN.COM
2025562010
Party name: NexPoint Advisors, L.P., et al.
Davor Rukavina
    Counsel of Record
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
3800 Ross Tower, 500 N. Akard St.
Dallas, TX 75201

drukavina@munsch.com
214-855-7587
Party name: James Dondero, NexPoint Advisors, L.P., and NexPoint Asset Management, L.P.