No. 22-63
Title:Antoin Deneil Marshal, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:July 22, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-92,202-01)
   Decision Date:November 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 16 2022Response Requested. (Due October 17, 2022)
Oct 05 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 17, 2022 to November 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 06 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 16, 2022.
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2022 to December 16, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 16, 2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randolph L. Schaffer
    Counsel of Record
Randy Schaffer, P.C.
1021 Main, Suite 1440
Houston, TX 77002

noguilt@swbell.net
713-951-9555
Party name: Antoin Marshal
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Miranda Harp
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General
300 West 15th
Austin, TX 78701

sarah.harp@oag.texas.gov
5129360638
Party name: Texas
Joshua ReissAssistant District Attorney
500 Jefferson, Suite 600
Houston, TX 77002

reiss_josh@dao.hctx.net
713-274-5800
Party name: Texas