No. 22-629
Title:David Holbrook, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee Valley Authority, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2023
Linked with 22A436
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1415)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2022Application (22A436) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2022 to January 5, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Application (22A436) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 5, 2023.
Jan 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2023)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2023Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2023Motion of BVU Authority to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2023The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2023, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Bienstock
    Counsel of Record
Bienstock PLLC
1629 K St. N.W.
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

mbienstock@bienstockpllc.com
2029086601
Party name: David Holbrook
Attorneys for Respondents
Cameron Scott Bell
    Counsel of Record
Penn, Stuart and Eskridge
208 East Main Street
Abingdon, VA 24212

CBELL@PENNSTUART.COM
276-628-5151
Party name: BVU Authority
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: Tennessee Valley Authority, et al.