No. 22-620
Title:Daniel Cox, Petitioner
v.
Maryland State Board of Elections
Docketed:January 6, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(COA-REG-00210-2022)
   Decision Date:October 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 6, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2023Waiver of right of respondent Maryland State Board of Elections to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 18 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
C. Edward Hartman III
    Counsel of Record
Hartman, Attorneys at Law
116 Defense Highway, Suite 300
Annapolis, MD 21401

ed@hartman.law
4102663232
Party name: Daniel L. Cox
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel Michael Kobrin
    Counsel of Record
Maryland Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place
Baltimore, MD 21202

dkobrin@oag.state.md.us
410 576 6472
Party name: Maryland State Board of Elections