No. 22-62
Title:Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Alden Big Man, et al.
Docketed:July 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-35223)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 21, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 22, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2022Waiver of right of respondents Unknown Members of the Crow Tribal Health Board; Kenneth Pitt, Justice of the Crow Tribal Court of Appeals; Dennis Myron Bear Don't Walk, Judge of the Crow Tribal Court, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2022Waiver of right of respondent Alden Big Man to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Sep 07 2022Response Requested. (Due October 7, 2022)
Sep 19 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2022 to November 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 7, 2022.
Nov 07 2022Brief of respondents Alden Big Man, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2022Reply of petitioner Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neil G. Westesen
    Counsel of Record
Crowley Fleck, PLLP
900 N Last Chance Gulch, Suite 200
P.O. Box 797
Helena, MT 59624-0797

nwestesen@crowleyfleck.com
4064494185
Party name: Big Horn County Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael Glenn Black
    Counsel of Record
Beck Amsden & Stalpes PLLC
2000 S 3rd Ave, Unit A
Bozeman, MT 59715

mike@becklawyers.com
406-586-8700
Party name: Alden Big Man
Melody L. McCoy
    Counsel of Record
Native American Rights Fund
1506 Broadway
Boulder, CO 80302-0000

mmccoy@narf.org
7206479691
Party name: Unknown Members of the Crow Tribal Health Board; Kenneth Pitt, Justice of the Crow Tribal Court of Appeals; Dennis Myron Bear Don't Walk, Judge of the Crow Tribal Court, et al.
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Alden Big Man, et al.