No. 22-614
Title:Troy Chrisman, et al., Petitioners
v.
Estate of Seth Michael Zakora, et al.
Docketed:January 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1620)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 3, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 6, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2023Waiver of right of respondent Estate of Seth Zakora, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023.
Feb 22 2023Response Requested. (Due March 24, 2023)
Mar 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 24, 2023 to April 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2023.
Mar 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Ohio, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2023Brief of respondents Estate of Seth Zakora, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 04 2023Reply of petitioners Troy Chrisman, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 09 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
May 23 2023Rescheduled.
May 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/1/2023.
May 31 2023Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ann Maurine Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
G. Mennen Williams Building
P.O. Box 30212
Lansing, MI 48909

ShermanA@michigan.gov
517-335-7628
Party name: Troy Chrisman, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher Patrick Desmond
    Counsel of Record
Johnson Law, PLC
535 Griswold Street, Suite 2632
Detroit, MI 48226

CDESMOND@VENJOHNSONLAW.COM
313-324-8300
Party name: Estate Of Seth Zakora, et al.
Other
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioago.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Kentucky, and Tennessee