No. 22-611
Title:Kevin Lindke, Petitioner
v.
James R. Freed
Docketed:January 4, 2023
Linked with 22A291
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2977)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:August 5, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2022Application (22A291) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 3, 2022 to January 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 07 2022Application (22A291) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until January 2, 2023.
Dec 29 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 3, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2023 to March 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 3, 2023.
Mar 03 2023Brief of respondent James R. Freed in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2023Reply of petitioner Kevin Lindke filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 24 2023Petition GRANTED.
May 01 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 23, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2023.
Jun 23 2023Brief of petitioner Kevin Lindke filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 23 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of The NRSC (also in 22-324) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Amicus First Amendment Clinics, Citizens and Journalists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of Michigan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of NetChoice, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Atheists, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Local Government Legal Center, et al. supporting neither party.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed. (Reprinted and resubmitted on 7/13/23).
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation, et al. filed (also in 22-324). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2023Brief of respondent James R. Freed filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 09 2023Brief amici curiae of Tennessee, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 06 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 31, 2023.
Sep 06 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit.
Sep 06 2023CIRCULATED.
Sep 07 2023Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. The remainder of the record is available on PACER.
Sep 07 2023Reply of petitioner Kevin Lindke filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 31 2023Argued. For petitioner: Allon Kedem, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Victoria R. Ferres, Port Huron, Mich.; and Masha G. Hansford, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029425000
Party name: Kevin Lindke
Attorneys for Respondent
Victoria Read Ferres
    Counsel of Record
Fletcher, Fealko, Shoudy & Francis, P.C.
1411 Third Street Suite F
Port Huron, MI 48060

VFERRES@FLETCHERFEALKO.COM
8109878444
Party name: James R. Freed
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Geoffrey Thomas Blackwell
    Counsel of Record
American Atheists, Inc.
2001 Columbia Pike
#212
Arlington, VA 22204

LEGAL@ATHEISTS.ORG
(908) 276-7300
Party name: American Atheists, Inc.
Jeremy Joseph Broggi
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

JBROGGI@WILEY.LAW
8438121527
Party name: The NRSC
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION AND THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MICHIGAN
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

BOB.CORN-REVERE@thefire.org
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
David Morris Gossett
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street NW
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

davidgossett@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: NetChoice, the Cato Institute, Chamber of Progress and the Computer and Communications Industry Association
David Allen Greene
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109-7701

DAVIDG@EFF.ORG
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation, Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University and Woodhull Freedom Foundation
Gregg P. Leslie
    Counsel of Record
ASU College of Law First Amendment Clinic
111 E. Taylor St.
Mailcode 8820
Phoenix, AZ 85004

GREGG.LESLIE@ASU.EDU
480-727-7398
Party name: Amicus First Amendment Clinics, Citizens and Journalists
Caroline Payseur Mackie
    Counsel of Record
Poyner Spruill LLP
P.O. Box 1801
Raleigh, NC 27602-1801

cmackie@poynerspruill.com
919-783-1108
Party name: Local Government Legal Center, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, and the International Municipal Lawyers Association
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas
James Matthew Rice
    Counsel of Record
Office of Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

MATT.RICE@AG.TN.GOV
615-532-6026
Party name: The State of Tennessee, et al.