No. 22-603
Title:Jevarreo Kelley-Lomax, Petitioner
v.
City of Chicago, Illinois
Docketed:December 30, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2891)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2023Waiver of right of respondent City of Chicago to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 18 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth N. Flaxman
    Counsel of Record
Kenneth N Flaxman P.C.
200 S Michigan Ave Ste 201
Chicago, IL 60604

knf@kenlaw.com
3124273200
Party name: Jevarreo Kelley-Lomax
Attorneys for Respondent
Suzanne M. Loose
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel - Chicago
2 N. LaSalle Street
Suite 580
Chicago, IL 60602

suzanne.loose@cityofchicago.org
3127448519
Party name: City of Chicago