No. 22-601 | |
Title: | Peter Lake, Chairman, Public Utility Commission of Texas, et al., Petitioners v. NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Incorporated, et al. |
Docketed: | December 30, 2022 |
Linked with 22A440 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-50160) |
Decision Date: | August 30, 2022 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 15 2022 | Application (22A440) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 18 2022 | Application (22A440) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 28, 2022. |
Dec 28 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 30 2023 | Brief of respondents NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Incorporated, et al. in opposition filed. (Docket entry corrected 2/7/22 to show this as a brief in opposition not brief in support) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 30 2023 | Brief of respondent Southwestern Public Service Company in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 30 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of ITC Holdings Corp. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 30 2023 | Brief of respondent Entergy Texas, Inc. in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 13 2023 | Reply of petitioners Chairman Peter Lake, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023. |
Mar 06 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Judd Edward Stone II Counsel of Record | Texas Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059) Austin, TX 78711-2548 judd.stone@oag.texas.gov | 512-936-1700 |
Party name: Chairman Peter Lake, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Lino Mendiola III Counsel of Record | Eversheds Sutherland (US ) LLP 600 Congress Ave. Suite 2000 Austin, TX 78701 LINOMENDIOLA@EVERSHEDS-SUTHERLAND.COM | 5127212700 |
Party name: Entergy Texas, Inc. | ||
Matthew Eben Price Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block, LLP 1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 MPRICE@JENNER.COM | 202-639-6000 |
Party name: Southwestern Public Service Company | ||
Stuart H. Singer Counsel of Record | Boies Schiller Flexner LLP 401 East Las Olas Boulevard suite 1200 fort lauderdale, FL 33301 SSINGER@BSFLLP.COM | 9543560011 |
Party name: NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Incorporated, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Aaron Michael Streett Counsel of Record | Baker Botts, L.L.P. 910 Louisiana Street Houston, TX 77002 AARON.STREETT@BAKERBOTTS.COM | 7132291855 |
Party name: ITC Holdings Corp. |