No. 22-593
Title:United States, ex rel. Deborah Sheldon, Petitioner
v.
Allergan Sales, LLC
Docketed:December 27, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2330)
   Decision Date:September 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory M. Utter
    Counsel of Record
Keating, Muething, Klekamp
1800 Provident Tower
One East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202

gmutter@kmklaw.com
513.579.6540
Party name: United States ex rel. Deborah Sheldon
Attorneys for Respondent
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

JOHN.ELWOOD@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Allergan Sales, LLC